U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America v. Kaz USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 11, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 15, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • June 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 27, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.