U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00155
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2021: [Appoint Expert]
  • October 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • October 04, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 23, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • September 15, 2021: [Strike]
  • September 13, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • September 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • August 10, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 21, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.