U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-01009
  • Case Name: Scruggs v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 09, 2023: [Case Ready for Decision]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Compel]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.