U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00158
  • Case Name: Myles v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [USCA Order]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 15, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 03, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 07, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 01, 2022: [Seal]
  • June 01, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 04, 2022: [Seal]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice - Other]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice - Other]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2021: [Errata]
  • October 04, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 03, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 03, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 10, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: [Affidavit]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 28, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 28, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 28, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 27, 2021: [Certificate]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.