U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00157
  • Case Name: NuVasive Inc. v. Harrison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 04, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 16, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • July 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 13, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • July 07, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 28, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 23, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 27, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 27, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 27, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.