U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Emory Industrial Services, Inc. et al v. Stewart et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • March 21, 2022: [Entry of Consent Judgment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Consent Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 15, 2021: [Enforce Judgment/Settlement]
  • October 05, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • September 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • September 15, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 10, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 08, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Declaration]
  • August 19, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 19, 2021: [Enforce Judgment/Settlement]
  • August 18, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 30, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • July 30, 2021: [Leave]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.