U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Close v. Menard, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 09, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2022: [*RETIRED*Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice - Other]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 11, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.