U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Warehouse Investors, LLC et al v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sealed Document]
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Seal]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • December 29, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 28, 2022: [Seal]
  • December 28, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 23, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 22, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Seal]
  • December 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 30, 2022: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • November 28, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • November 16, 2022: [In Limine]
  • November 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [Objections - Generic]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • October 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 11, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 11, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 11, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • October 04, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • October 04, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 16, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 06, 2022: [Compel]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • August 22, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 18, 2022: [Compel]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Compel]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 27, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 23, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 24, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 22, 2021: [Errata]
  • September 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 27, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 26, 2021: [Proposed Decree]
  • July 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2021: [Proposed Decree]
  • July 13, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • July 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 01, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 11, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.