U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00176
  • Case Name: Davis v. Gibbs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2022: [Brief /Other]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Brief /Other]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • September 27, 2021: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 17, 2021: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 16, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • September 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 10, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.