U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Vermeer Manufacturing Company v. Vermeer Rocky Mountain, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 11, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 11, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.