U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Flores et al v. BHA Group, Inc et al - IF DISPOSITIVE MOTION FILED SEE #31 ORDER FOR UPDATE TO RESPONSE AND REPLY DEADLINES THAT HAVE BEEN SET
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.