U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00186
  • Case Name: Tucker v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 31, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 31, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 23, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.