U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00185
  • Case Name: Wabshaw et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 12, 2022: [Stipulation]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • August 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • August 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 01, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [In Limine]
  • July 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 18, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • May 06, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • November 30, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 21, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 12, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.