U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00187
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Scott County Jail
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 25, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • January 18, 2022: [Reconsideration]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 12, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 01, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 23, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 17, 2021: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • September 17, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • September 16, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 14, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 09, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 07, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 03, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 02, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 01, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 13, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 13, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 12, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 07, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 29, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 25, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.