U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Skogman Realty Co. v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • December 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 11, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 16, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 09, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.