U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Limke v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 22, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Remand]
  • April 13, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Remand]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 03, 2022: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • November 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 07, 2021: [Errata]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 29, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 25, 2021: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.