U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-02036
  • Case Name: Simmons et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 05, 2022: [Remand]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.