U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Ruesga v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 19, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • November 16, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 16, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • November 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.