U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00189
  • Case Name: Gordon v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 27, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 16, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.