U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Probioferm, LLC v. Fluid Air, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Compel]
  • November 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 12, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Leave]
  • October 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 01, 2021: [Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 10, 2021: [Declaration]
  • September 10, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • September 10, 2021: [Compel]
  • September 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2021: [Errata]
  • August 05, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.