U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-04024
  • Case Name: Griner et al v. King et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 01, 2022: [Alter Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [In Limine]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2022: [Strike]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 07, 2022: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Protective Order]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.