U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-02038
  • Case Name: International Association of Sheet metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers et al v. Iowa Northern Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 05, 2021: [Stay]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 02, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.