U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Diouf v. State Farm Insurance Companies, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 20, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.