U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Coelho, Jr v. Cognizant Technology Solutions Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 21, 2022: [Stipulation]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • July 21, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 20, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 20, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 18, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • July 15, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 14, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 17, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 03, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 29, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 06, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 06, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 06, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.