U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Gordon v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 17, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 03, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 02, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.