U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Bern v. The Des Moines Area Association of Realtors
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Report regarding Copyright]
  • August 03, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 02, 2022: [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Closing Documents]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Answer to Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint]
  • March 15, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • March 14, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 10, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 20, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 16, 2021: [Errata]
  • September 13, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Answer to Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 14, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 02, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 02, 2021: [Report regarding Copyright]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.