U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00199
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Iowa Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 23, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Stay]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 23, 2021: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 06, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.