U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Saner v. Gibbs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 28, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • September 22, 2021: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • September 22, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 06, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.