U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-01006
  • Case Name: McGonigle v. Dubuque, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Withdraw]
  • December 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 17, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 16, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 06, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.