U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Montelongo v. St. Ambrose University
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • March 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 09, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 06, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 26, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 26, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.