U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Welch v. Barry et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • August 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Closing Documents]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Stay]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 14, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • August 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • August 02, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 28, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 12, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 07, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.