U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Lane v. Muscatine Logistics LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Sealed Document]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 25, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 25, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 07, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.