U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Ambassador Steel Fabrication, LLC v. CMT Highway, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.