U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Browder v. SouthLaw et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 02, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Recusal]
  • February 23, 2022: [Recusal]
  • February 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • January 12, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 12, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 12, 2022: [Stay]
  • January 03, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • January 03, 2022: [Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 09, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 12, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 12, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 18, 2021: [Strike]
  • August 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 09, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 02, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Stay]
  • July 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.