U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Sanders v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 10, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 03, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.