U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Doe et al v. Lewis Central Community School District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Create Case Association]
  • August 30, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 27, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • July 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • July 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 14, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.