U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Genesis Systems Group, LLC v. North Coast Composites, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • July 14, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 13, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.