U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00209
  • Case Name: Mora Luna v. Menard, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 03, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • February 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [Protective Order]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Errata]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 14, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.