U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Enderle v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 21, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • April 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • October 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 27, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.