U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04054
  • Case Name: Norambuena et al v. Western Iowa Tech Community College et al See order at [119] to set responsive pleading deadline after Motion to Dismiss is ruled on
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • August 20, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 02, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 13, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.