U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00210
  • Case Name: Weiss-Kreps v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 08, 2021: [Brief /Other]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • October 19, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 18, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • July 16, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 15, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2021: [Complaint]
  • July 14, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 13, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • July 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.