U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-02031
  • Case Name: Brubaker, et al v. Kuper, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 23, 2021: [Appoint Receiver]
  • December 23, 2021: [Expedite]
  • December 06, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.