U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Fairfield Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Mail Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 24, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 23, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • August 09, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 14, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • July 14, 2021: [Remark]
  • July 14, 2021: [Complaint]
  • July 14, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.