U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Hussey v. 8 One 8, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Report regarding Copyright]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Default Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • November 07, 2022: [Default Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Default Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Default Entry by Clerk]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Report regarding Copyright]
  • July 16, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 15, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • July 15, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.