U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00401
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Weiss et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • August 29, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 29, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Errata]
  • July 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 20, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Non-Appearance (Attorney General only)]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Review Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.