U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Beloved v. Lamb
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 08, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Reply]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 20, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 20, 2021: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.