U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Luong et al v. House et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 17, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 01, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • November 01, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • October 28, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 28, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 27, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 27, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 17, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 26, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 25, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 23, 2021: [Strike]
  • August 23, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 23, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 13, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 23, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.