U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Kwaw-Mensah v. Comenity Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • October 08, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 16, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 08, 2021: [Stay]
  • September 03, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 23, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 06, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 22, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.