U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00244
  • Case Name: Hill v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 17, 2022: [Stipulation]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 06, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 23, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 10, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2022: [Statement]
  • January 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 30, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 01, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • August 20, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 20, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 20, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.