U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00264
  • Case Name: The Arc of Iowa et al v. Reynolds et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • December 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 05, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Documents Sent]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 09, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 12, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 12, 2022: [Errata]
  • August 05, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 01, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 06, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • July 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 01, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 01, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [USCA Order]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Documents Sent]
  • October 19, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 18, 2021: [Stay]
  • October 15, 2021: [Stay]
  • October 15, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • October 08, 2021: [TRO]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • September 30, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 29, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • September 28, 2021: [Leave]
  • September 28, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 17, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 17, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • September 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [TRO]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Errata]
  • September 10, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • September 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • September 09, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 08, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 07, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 04, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • September 03, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 03, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 03, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.